Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0654757

EP0654757 - A printing apparatus and a control method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  21.06.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2002Opposition rejectedpublished on 07.08.2002  [2002/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Former [1995/21]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Teradaira, Mitsuaki, Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392 / JP
02 / Koakutsu, Naohiko, Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392 / JP
03 / Hyonaga, Takuya, Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392 / JP
[1995/21]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/21]Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103
D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date94118030.915.11.1994
[1995/21]
Priority number, dateJP1993028700216.11.1993         Original published format: JP 28700293
[1995/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0654757
Date:24.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0654757
Date:08.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0654757
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:G06K15/00, G06F3/12
[1999/12]
Former International [1995/44]G06K15/00, G06K15/02
Former International [1995/21]G06K15/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/21]
TitleGerman:Druckvorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür[1995/21]
English:A printing apparatus and a control method therefor[1995/21]
French:Appareil d'impression et méthode pour son contrôle[1995/21]
Examination procedure15.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/21]
19.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
12.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1999Fee for grant paid
30.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.11.2000   
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Opponent's representative
Roth, Ronald G.
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Patentanwälte, P.O.Box 20 19 18
80019 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/52]
Opponent(s)01  02.11.2000   
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Opponent's representative
Roth, Ronald, Dipl.-Ing.
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Patentanwälte, P.O.Box 20 19 18
80019 München / DE
06.12.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.06.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.02.2002Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/32]
06.02.2002Date of oral proceedings
06.03.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.03.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2225468  (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,10,12,13 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 15; claim - * * page 42, line 22 - page 46, line 4 *;
 [XA]US5124809  (KOISHIKAWA AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1,10 * column 29, line 59 - column 30, line 21; claim - * [A] 2-9,11-16;
 [A]US4930087  (EGAWA JIRO [JP], et al)