Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0653238

EP0653238 - Catalyst for purifying exhaust gases and process for purifying exhaust gases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO
41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun
Aichi-ken, 480-11 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO
41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho
Aichi-gun Aichi-ken, 480-11 / JP
Former [1995/20]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471 / JP
For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA CHUO KENKYUSHO
41-1, Aza Yokomichi Oaza Nagakute Nagakute-cho
Aichi-gun Aichi-ken, 480-11 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyoshi, Naoto, c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K.
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Kimura, Mareo, c/o K.K. Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho
41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute
Nagakute-cho, Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Kawai, Yuzo, c/o K.K. Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho
41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute
Nagakute-cho, Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Kumai, Yoko, c/o K.K. Toyota Chuo Kenkyusho
41-1, Aza Yokomichi, Oaza Nagakute
Nagakute-cho, Aichi-gun, Aichi-ken / JP
[1995/20]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [1995/20]KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
D-85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date94118037.415.11.1994
[1995/20]
Priority number, dateJP1993028830217.11.1993         Original published format: JP 28830293
[1995/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0653238
Date:17.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0653238
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/94, B01J23/56, B01J23/58
[1995/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/20]
TitleGerman:Katalysator und Verfahren zum Reinigen von Abgasen[1995/20]
English:Catalyst for purifying exhaust gases and process for purifying exhaust gases[1995/20]
French:Catalyseur et procédé pour la purification de gaz d'échappement[1995/20]
Examination procedure15.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/20]
28.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.12.2000Fee for grant paid
20.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)15.12.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0488250  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 5 - line 9 * * page 1, line 41 - line 51 * * page 3, line 13 - line 29 *;
 [X]EP0485180  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 4, line 49 - page 5, line 56; claims 1-17 *;
 [X]EP0507590  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 5, line 9 - line 29; claims 1-13; tables 14,16 *;
 [X]WO9204965  (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 1,6-8,13,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0556554  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1,4-8,11-14 * page 6, line 5 - line 29; claims 1-18 *;
 [X]DE2518536  (DU PONT) [X] 1,6-8,13,14 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 1; examples 1,4,12,14 *
by applicantJPH04130904
 JPH05317652