Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0713195

EP0713195 - Remote identification system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2001
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.2001 [2001/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schenke, Kay-Uwe, Dipl. Ing.
Töpferstr. 27
D-41515 Grevenbroich / DE
[1996/21]
Representative(s)Bird, William Edward
Bird Goën & Co
Wetenschapspark Arenberg
Gaston Geenslaan 9
3001 Heverlee / BE
[N/P]
Former [1997/45]Bird, William Edward
Bird Goen & Co., Termerestraat 1
3020 Winksele / BE
Former [1996/21]Bird, William Edward , et al
Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, 3M Europe S.A./N.V., Hermeslaan 7
B-1831 Brussel / BE
Application number, filing date94118158.817.11.1994
[1996/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0713195
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0713195
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/06
[1996/21]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1996/21]
TitleGerman:Fernidentifizierungssystem[1996/21]
English:Remote identification system[1996/21]
French:Système d'identification à distance[1996/21]
Examination procedure13.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/02]
25.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2000Fee for grant paid
14.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00106562.2  / EP1039412
Opposition(s)05.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US4319674  (RIGGS DEAN D, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 1A; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5204526  (YAMASHITA MITSUO [US], et al) [A] 1,7,10,12,14,17 * column 4, line 29 - line 44 * * column 7, line 31 - line 37 *;
 [A]GB2098768  (BANK OF ENGLAND THE GOVERNOR &) [A] 1,5,11 * claim 1 *;
 [DA]US4746908  (MONTEAN SAMUEL [US]) [DA] 1,5 * column 6, line 36 - line 40 *