Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0656261 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0656261



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 941
25.11.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
25.11.1994 Drawings Search / examination 22
25.11.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
25.11.1994 Description Search / examination 63
25.11.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 23
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 26
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 28
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 30
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 16
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 29
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 26
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 67
17.03.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.04.1995 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 34
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 41
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 97
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 46
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 37
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 42
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 36
10.04.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
02.02.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
02.02.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.05.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.09.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.09.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.11.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
24.11.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
06.05.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.09.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.09.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.11.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.11.1998 Drawings Search / examination 13
11.11.1998 Description Search / examination 27
11.11.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
15.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
01.04.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 154
01.04.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
05.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
19.08.1999 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.10.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
18.01.2000 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
18.01.2000 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
18.01.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
27.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1