blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0656261 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0656261



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 941
27.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
18.01.2000 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
15.10.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
08.10.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.08.1999 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
05.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
01.04.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
01.04.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 154
15.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
11.11.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
11.11.1998 Description Search / examination 27
11.11.1998 Drawings Search / examination 13
11.11.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.09.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.09.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.05.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.11.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
24.11.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
24.09.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.09.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.05.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.02.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.02.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
10.04.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 34
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 41
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 97
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 46
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 37
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 42
10.04.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 36
05.04.1995 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
17.03.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 23
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 26
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 28
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 30
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 16
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 29
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 26
17.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 67
25.11.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.11.1994 Description Search / examination 63
25.11.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
25.11.1994 Drawings Search / examination 22
25.11.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6