blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0656261


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
01.02.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.12.1999 Renewal fee
12.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
12.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
09.12.1998 Renewal fee
18.11.1998 Examination report or reply
10.09.1998 Examination report or reply
30.04.1998 Examination report or reply
05.12.1997 Renewal fee
28.11.1997 Examination report or reply
20.09.1997 Examination report or reply
09.05.1997 First examination report
07.05.1997 Examination report or reply
05.12.1996 Renewal fee
16.08.1996 Request for examination filed published on  02.10.1996 [1996/40]
02.02.1996 Publication of search report published on  20.03.1996 [1996/12]
26.01.1996 Change - classification published on  13.03.1996 [1996/11]
21.04.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.06.1995 [1995/23]