blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0656261
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH0839804Global Dossier 13.02.1996A
Priority number Date
JP17715494 28.07.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3376049BGlobal Dossier 10.02.2003B2
JPH07148944 13.06.1995A
Priority number Date
JP29621993 26.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3155416BGlobal Dossier 09.04.2001B2
JPH07156405 20.06.1995A
Priority number Date
JP30518693 06.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3129915BGlobal Dossier 31.01.2001B2
JPH0858097 05.03.1996A
Priority number Date
JP19980894 24.08.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3126570BGlobal Dossier 22.01.2001B2
JPH07156406 20.06.1995A
Priority number Date
JP30518793 06.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3126569BGlobal Dossier 22.01.2001B2
JPH07156404 20.06.1995A
Priority number Date
JP30518593 06.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3115755BGlobal Dossier 11.12.2000B2
JPH07148926 13.06.1995A
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3103273BGlobal Dossier 30.10.2000B2
JPH0839806 13.02.1996A
Priority number Date
JP17892794 29.07.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0656261Global Dossier 26.04.2000B1
EP0656261 20.03.1996A3
EP0656261 07.06.1995A2
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
JP19980894 24.08.1994
JP30518793 06.12.1993
JP30518593 06.12.1993
JP30518693 06.12.1993
JP29621993 26.11.1993
JP17715494 28.07.1994
JP17892794 29.07.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU682409B 02.10.1997B2
AU7903794 01.06.1995A
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
JP19980894 24.08.1994
JP30518793 06.12.1993
JP30518593 06.12.1993
JP30518693 06.12.1993
JP29621993 26.11.1993
JP17715494 28.07.1994
JP17892794 29.07.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2136514 11.01.2000C
CA2136514 27.05.1995A1
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
JP19980894 24.08.1994
JP30518793 06.12.1993
JP30518593 06.12.1993
JP30518693 06.12.1993
JP29621993 26.11.1993
JP17715494 28.07.1994
JP17892794 29.07.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1096950C 25.12.2002C
CN1117438 28.02.1996A
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
JP19980894 24.08.1994
JP30518793 06.12.1993
JP30518593 06.12.1993
JP30518693 06.12.1993
JP29621993 26.11.1993
JP17715494 28.07.1994
JP17892794 29.07.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69424131D 31.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
JP19980894 24.08.1994
JP30518793 06.12.1993
JP30518593 06.12.1993
JP30518693 06.12.1993
JP29621993 26.11.1993
JP17715494 28.07.1994
JP17892794 29.07.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69424131T 09.11.2000T2
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
JP19980894 24.08.1994
JP30518793 06.12.1993
JP30518593 06.12.1993
JP30518693 06.12.1993
JP29621993 26.11.1993
JP17715494 28.07.1994
JP17892794 29.07.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2148269T 16.10.2000T3
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
JP19980894 24.08.1994
JP30518793 06.12.1993
JP30518593 06.12.1993
JP30518693 06.12.1993
JP29621993 26.11.1993
JP17715494 28.07.1994
JP17892794 29.07.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR0163220B 30.03.1999B1
KR950013725 15.06.1995A
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
JP19980894 24.08.1994
JP30518793 06.12.1993
JP30518593 06.12.1993
JP30518693 06.12.1993
JP29621993 26.11.1993
JP17715494 28.07.1994
JP17892794 29.07.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6155677 05.12.2000A
Priority number Date
JP29622293 26.11.1993
JP19980894 24.08.1994
JP30518793 06.12.1993
JP30518593 06.12.1993
JP30518693 06.12.1993
JP29621993 26.11.1993
JP17715494 28.07.1994
JP17892794 29.07.1994