Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0656261

EP0656261 - An ink jet recording head, an ink jet unit and an ink jet apparatus using said recording head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/23]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kitani, Masashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
02 / Sugitani, Hiroshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
03 / Kashima, Yasuro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
04 / Takenouchi, Masanori, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
05 / Nagami, Tadanobu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
06 / Maeoka, Kunihiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
07 / Sato, Nobuyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
08 / Yamamoto, Hajime, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
09 / Ito, Susumu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
10 / Nozawa, Minoru, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
11 / Tsujimoto, Akira, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
12 / Karita, Seiichiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
13 / Miyagawa, Masashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
[1995/23]
Representative(s)Grams, Klaus Dieter
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/23]Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date94118590.225.11.1994
[1995/23]
Priority number, dateJP1993029621926.11.1993         Original published format: JP 29621993
JP1993029622226.11.1993         Original published format: JP 29622293
JP1993030518506.12.1993         Original published format: JP 30518593
JP1993030518606.12.1993         Original published format: JP 30518693
JP1993030518706.12.1993         Original published format: JP 30518793
JP1994017715428.07.1994         Original published format: JP 17715494
JP1994017892729.07.1994         Original published format: JP 17892794
JP1994019980824.08.1994         Original published format: JP 19980894
[1995/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0656261
Date:07.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0656261
Date:20.03.1996
[1996/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0656261
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/14, B41J2/16
[1996/11]
Former International [1995/23]B41J2/14
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1995/23]
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf, Tintenstrahleinheit und Tintenstrahlgerät mit diesem Aufzeichnungskopf[1995/23]
English:An ink jet recording head, an ink jet unit and an ink jet apparatus using said recording head[1995/23]
French:Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre, unité et dispositif d'éjection d'encre utilisant la tête d'enregistrement[1995/23]
Examination procedure06.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/40]
12.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2000Fee for grant paid
18.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPS5793163  ;
 [YA]EP0322228  (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 18 * column 1, line 40 - line 58; figure 5 * [A] 1,3,19-21;
 [Y]JPH05212876  ;
 [PX]JPH06198898  ;
 [A]EP0528440  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3,19-21 * column 1, line 5 - line 30 * * column 5, line 30 - line 42; figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0538842  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,18-21 * column 23, line 49 - line 57; figure 26 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820921), vol. 6, no. 184, Database accession no. (M - 157)<1062> , [X] 1,3,4,19-21 * abstract * [Y] 6,7,18
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931203), vol. 17, no. 652, Database accession no. (M - 1520), [Y] 6,7 * abstract *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941021), vol. 18, no. 554, Database accession no. (M - 1691), [PX] 1,3,19-21 * abstract *
by applicantEP0322228
 JPS5793163