Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0660086

EP0660086 - Optical measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bertholds, Axel, Dr.
6653 Verscio / CH
For all designated states
Braunschweiler, Andreas
Sentiero Rogorogno 10a
6605 Locarno, Monti della Trinita / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Bertholds, Axel, Dr.
6653 Versico / CH
For all designated states
Braunschweiler, Andreas
Sentiero Rogorogno 10a
6605 Locarno, Monto della Trinia / CH
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
AGIE SA
Via dei Pioppi 2
6616 Losone / CH
Former [1995/26]For all designated states
A.G. für industrielle Elektronik AGIE Losone bei Locarno
Via dei Pioppi 2
CH-6616 Losone / CH
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/48]
Former [1995/26]01 / Bertholds, Axel, Dr.
0
CH-6654 Cavigliano / CH
02 / Braunschweiler, Andreas
Piazza Casa Cecilia
CH-6614 Brissago / CH
Representative(s)Turi, Michael , et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/26]Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date94118594.425.11.1994
[1995/26]
Priority number, dateDE1993434354920.12.1993         Original published format: DE 4343549
[1995/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0660086
Date:28.06.1995
Language:DE
[1995/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0660086
Date:27.11.1996
[1996/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0660086
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/34, G01B11/24
[1995/26]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1995/26]
TitleGerman:Optische Messvorrichtung[1995/26]
English:Optical measuring device[1995/26]
French:Dispositif de mesure optique[1995/26]
Examination procedure18.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
26.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.1999Fee for grant paid
20.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0532933  (TOKYO SEIMITSU CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7,12,15 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4166950  (JANZEN JAY [US]) [A] 1,12,15 * column A *
 [X]  H.BUSCHMANN, "Optische Wegmesssonde", FEINWERKTECHNIK + MESSTECHNIK, DE, (198103), vol. 89, no. 2, pages 87 - 89, XP002014923 [X] 1-4,12,15 * the whole document *