Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0657886

EP0657886 - Magnetic tape cartridge having triple lid assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Maxell Ltd.
No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Hitachi Maxell Ltd.
No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [1995/24]For all designated states
Hitachi Maxell Ltd.
No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mizutani, Hikaru
1-18-25, Sakurai
Mino-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
02 / Inoue, Mikihisa
1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki-cho
Otokuni-gun, Kyoto-fu / JP
03 / Masuda, Kenmei, E-205 Green Park
Totsuka Hills, 1269, Shimokurata-cho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
04 / Takeda, Hidekazu
407 Towa City-Coop, Hiratsuka, 3-18-33, Goten
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1995/24]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/24]Selting, Günther , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
D-50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date94118640.529.11.1994
[1995/24]
Priority number, dateJP1993032619529.11.1993         Original published format: JP 32619593
[1995/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0657886
Date:14.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0657886
Date:28.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0657886
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:G11B23/087
[1995/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1995/24]
TitleGerman:Magnetische Bandkassette mit dreifachem Türzusammenbau[1995/24]
English:Magnetic tape cartridge having triple lid assembly[1995/24]
French:Cassette pour bande magnétique avec un assemblage pour triple couvercle[1995/24]
Examination procedure22.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/08]
08.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
01.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
10.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.1999Fee for grant paid
26.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99109988.8  / EP0935250
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[DX]FR2508223  (SONY CORP [JP]) [DX] 1 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 33; figures 4,7-9 *;
 [X]EP0570132  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 9, line 40 - column 12, line 53; figures 5,10B *