blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0656204

EP0656204 - Controlled release pharmaceutical tablet having lenticular form [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2002
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.10.2002  [2002/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAGOTEC AG
Eptingerstrasse 51
4132 Muttenz / CH
[2001/36]
Former [1996/46]For all designated states
JAGOTEC AG
Seestrasse 47
6502 Hergiswil / CH
Former [1995/23]For all designated states
EKITA Investments N.V.
9 Kaya Flamboyan
Curaçao / NA
Inventor(s)01 / Conte, Ubaldo
Via Treviglio 6
I-21052 Busto Arsizio (Prov. of Varese) / IT
02 / La Manna, Aldo
Via Lanfranco 3
I-27100 Pavia / IT
03 / Maggi, Lauretta
Via Folperti 3
I-27100 Pavia / IT
[1995/23]
Representative(s)Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/27]Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [1995/23]Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al
Studio Brevetti e Marchi NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.r.l. 33, Viale Bianca Maria
I-20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date94118664.528.11.1994
[1995/23]
Priority number, dateIT1993MI0251930.11.1993         Original published format: IT MI932519
[1995/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0656204
Date:07.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0656204
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.1995
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/20
[1995/23]
CPC:
A61K9/2086 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/23]
Extension statesLT20.12.1994
SI20.12.1994
TitleGerman:Linsenförmig pharmazeutische Tablette mit verzögerter Freigabe[1995/23]
English:Controlled release pharmaceutical tablet having lenticular form[1995/23]
French:Comprimé pharmaceutique lenticulaire à libération contrôlée[1995/23]
Examination procedure29.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/06]
22.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2000Date of oral proceedings
28.03.2000Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2001Fee for grant paid
27.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB888038  (WILLIAM WARREN TRIGGS C B E) [Y] 9-11 * figure 6 ** page 3, line 60 - line 71; claim 1 *;
 [DXY]EP0432607  (JAGOTEC AG [CH]) [DX] 1-8 * figure 2 * * claim 1 * [Y] 9-11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.