Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0657476

EP0657476 - Alpha-olefin polymers, alpha-olefin polymerizing catalyst and process for producing alpha-olefin polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  16.11.2007
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2007Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 19.12.2007  [2007/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
[2007/51]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
Former [1996/38]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Former [1995/24]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ebara, Takeshi
9-144, Yushudainishi-1-chome
Ichihara-shi / JP
02 / Mizunuma, Koji
37-7, Hachimandai-5-chome
Kisarazu-shi / JP
03 / Sasaki, Toshio
900, Saihiro
Ichihara-shi / JP
04 / Wakamatsu, Kazuki
11-13, Nagauraekimae-6-chome
Sodegaura-shi / JP
05 / Kimura, Junichi
6-5, Honmachi-9-chome
Toyonaka-shi / JP
06 / Obata, Yoichi
9-243, Yushudainishi-1-chome
Ichihara-shi / JP
[1995/24]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/24]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner
Möhlstrasse 37
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date94118696.728.11.1994
[1995/24]
Priority number, dateJP1993030531806.12.1993         Original published format: JP 30531893
JP1994008143820.04.1994         Original published format: JP 8143894
[1995/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0657476
Date:14.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0657476
Date:27.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0657476
Date:03.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/23]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0657476
Date:19.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/00, C08F10/06, C08F4/645
[1995/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/24]
TitleGerman:Alphaolefinpolymere, Katalysator zur Alphaolefinpolymeristation und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alphaolefinpolymeren[1995/24]
English:Alpha-olefin polymers, alpha-olefin polymerizing catalyst and process for producing alpha-olefin polymers[1995/24]
French:Polymères d'alpha oléfine, catalyseur pour le polymérisation d'alpha oléfines et procédé de préparation d'un polymère d'alpha oléfine[1995/24]
Examination procedure05.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
10.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
23.10.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.10.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.1998Fee for grant paid
04.02.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP97118079.9  / EP0844259
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.03.1999  10.03.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property - F206
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [2003/39]
Former [2001/15]
Opponent(s)01  01.03.1999  10.03.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Polypropylen GmbH c/o BASF AG
Patente, Marken und Lizenzen - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1999/16]
Opponent(s)01  01.03.1999   
TARGOR GmbH C/O BASF AG
Patente, Marken und Lizenzen-C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
16.04.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.10.1999Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.02.2001Date of oral proceedings
22.02.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2004Reply to a communication from the opposition division
05.10.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.10.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.01.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
03.05.2005Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition02.05.2001Appeal received No.  T0477/01
04.07.2001Statement of grounds filed
05.11.2003Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
05.11.2003Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB28.11.2004
FR29.07.2005
IT28.11.2005
[2007/34]
Former [2006/14]GB28.11.2004
FR29.07.2005
Former [2006/13]GB28.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0376084  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LTD.) [X] 1-14 * page 4, line 5 - line 6; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0445302  (TONEN CORPORATION) [X] 1-14 * example - *;
 [X]EP0282341  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 1-14 * example 1 *;
 [PX]EP0576413  (FINA TECHNOLOGY INC.) [PX] 1-14 * claim 1 *
OppositionEP0318049
 EP0515855
    - Macromolecules, vol. 21, 1988, pp. 2309-2313
    - Journal of Molecular Catalysis, vol. 56, 1989, pp. 237-247
    - Kunststoffe, vol. 74, 1984, pp. 225-228
    - Polymer Engineering and Science, 1989, vol. 29, no. 6, pp. 390-396
    - Kunststoff Taschenbuch, 24. Ausgabe, Hanser Verlag, München, 1989, p. 371