Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0657476 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0657476



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 779
23.11.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
23.11.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
16.11.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
12.04.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 1
17.03.2006 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
03.05.2005 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
03.05.2005 French translation of claims Opposition 3
03.05.2005 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
24.01.2005 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
24.01.2005 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
24.01.2005 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
19.01.2005 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
11.11.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.10.2004 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
12.10.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.10.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.10.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.10.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.10.2004 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
05.10.2004 Text intended for grant Opposition 23
01.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.06.2004 Description Opposition 19
23.06.2004 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
25.02.2004 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
19.02.2004 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
05.01.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 33
14.11.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
15.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.10.2003 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 1
06.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.08.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.08.2003 Communication: Transfer of procedural status Appeal 1
07.08.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.07.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
23.07.2003 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
23.07.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.07.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.07.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 1
15.07.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.07.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.07.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.07.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
04.07.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
01.07.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.02.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.02.2002 Claims Appeal 2
14.02.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
25.01.2002 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
25.01.2002 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
22.01.2002 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
21.11.2001 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
21.11.2001 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
16.11.2001 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.07.2001 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.07.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.07.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.07.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
15.05.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
11.05.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
09.05.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
02.05.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.05.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.02.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.02.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.02.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.02.2001 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
22.02.2001 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 19
22.02.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 18
22.02.2001 Text intended for grant Opposition 22
07.02.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
07.02.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.12.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
11.12.2000 Drawings Opposition 2
11.12.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.12.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.12.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
15.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.12.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.12.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
08.12.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
08.12.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
08.12.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
22.11.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.11.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.11.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.10.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
27.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.08.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.03.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.03.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.03.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
03.03.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.03.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.03.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
03.03.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.03.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
03.03.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.03.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
03.03.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
03.03.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.03.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
23.04.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.02.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.02.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
04.02.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
27.01.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.10.1997 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
20.10.1997 Description Search / examination 1
20.10.1997 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.06.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
20.06.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 58
28.05.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
20.01.1997 Claims Search / examination 5
20.01.1997 Description Search / examination 27
20.01.1997 Drawings Search / examination 1
20.01.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
10.09.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.11.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.11.1995 European search report Search / examination 4
19.05.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.04.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.04.1995 European search report Search / examination 3
22.03.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 32
22.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 31
22.03.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 52
22.03.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 49
28.11.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.11.1994 Claims Search / examination 5
28.11.1994 Description Search / examination 53
28.11.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
28.11.1994 Drawings Search / examination 1
28.11.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6