EP0715155 - Ultrasonic flowmeter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greppmaier, Paul Salzburger Strasse 18 D-90475 Nürnberg / DE | [1996/23] | Application number, filing date | 94119059.7 | 02.12.1994 | [1996/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0715155 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715155 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
G01F1/662 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, LI, NL, SE [1996/34] |
Former [1996/23] | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Ultraschall-Durchflussmessanordnung | [1996/23] | English: | Ultrasonic flowmeter | [1996/23] | French: | Débitmètre à ultrason | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 20.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 15.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.1996 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4103551 (LYNNWORTH LAWRENCE C) [X] 1-4 * column 12, line 46 - column 13, line 3 * * column 14, line 10 - line 54; figures 9,11 *; | [X]EP0268314 (SERVEX BV [NL]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]DE4010148 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]WO9114925 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 11, line 10 - page 12, line 24; figure 2 *; | [E]DE4336370 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [E] 1* ZUSAMMENFASSUNG *; page 3, line 12 - line 40; figure 4 * |