Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0661849

EP0661849 - Data bus system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  24.04.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2009Change - rejection of oppositionpublished on 27.05.2009  [2009/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH
Theresienstrasse 2
74072 Heilbronn / DE
For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1999/14]For all designated states
TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH
Theresienstrasse 2
D-74072 Heilbronn / DE
For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1997/39]For all designated states
TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH
Theresienstrasse 2
D-74072 Heilbronn / DE
For all designated states
DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1995/27]For all designated states
TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH
Theresienstrasse 2
D-74072 Heilbronn / DE
For all designated states
MERCEDES-BENZ AG
Mercedesstrasse 136
D-70327 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Häussler, Bernd
Drosselweg 5
D-73760 Ostfildern / DE
02 / Münk, German
Hadwigstr. 7
D-88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
03 / Meyer, Benno
Silvrettablick 17
D-88682 Salem / DE
[1995/27]
Representative(s)Berghold, Klaus
Daimler AG
Intellectual Property Management
HPC C 106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]Berghold, Klaus
DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management HPC C 106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1995/27]Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing.
TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2
D-74072 Heilbronn / DE
Application number, filing date94119087.803.12.1994
[1995/27]
Priority number, dateDE1993434203609.12.1993         Original published format: DE 4342036
[1995/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0661849
Date:05.07.1995
Language:DE
[1995/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0661849
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/40, H04L29/14
[1995/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1995/27]
TitleGerman:Datenbussystem[1995/27]
English:Data bus system[1995/27]
French:Système de bus de données[1995/27]
Examination procedure17.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/28]
14.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1999Fee for grant paid
14.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.11.2000  22.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Leuze electronic GmbH + Co
In der Braike 1
73277 Owen/Teck / DE
Opponent's representative
Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard
Patentanwalt
Jurastrasse 1
73087 Bad Boll / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/52]
Opponent(s)01  03.11.2000   
Leuze electronic GmbH + Co
In der Braike 1
73277 Owen/Teck / DE
Opponent's representative
Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard, Dr.
Fabrikstrasse 18
73277 Owen/Teck / DE
27.02.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.04.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.05.2001Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2001Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
20.05.2003Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/22]
20.05.2003Date of oral proceedings
13.08.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.08.2003Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
23.08.2003Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9008437  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,6-9 * abstract *
 [A]  D. PARET, "APPLICATIONS DU BUS CAN", ELECTRONIQUE RADIO PLANS, PARIS FR, (199212), no. 541, pages 63 - 69, XP000323504 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  C. J. GEORGOPOULOS, "DEVICES ANS SUBSYSTEMS CONNECTIONS IN MODERN ELECTRONIC OFFICES : SOME ANNOYING PROBLEMS", MELECON '85, MADRID ES, (198510), vol. 2, pages 447 - 450, XP000811486 [A] 1-4 * paragraph [3.1.] *
 [A]  "ACTIVE TERMINATORS FOR CMOS DRIVERS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198909), vol. 32, no. 4A, pages 393 - 395, [A] 1-5 * the whole document *