Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0660460

EP0660460 - Electrical connector for mounting on a printed circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/26]For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle Illinois 60532 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Regnier, Kent E.
141 S. Grace
Lombard, Illinois 60148 / US
[1995/26]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
PatentConsult
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/26]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner
Patentanwälte, Sonnenberger Strasse 100
D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date94119708.914.12.1994
[1995/26]
Priority number, dateUS1993017358422.12.1993         Original published format: US 173584
[1995/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0660460
Date:28.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0660460
Date:13.11.1996
[1996/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0660460
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/16, H01R13/405, H01R12/22, H01R13/41
[2000/15]
Former International [1996/45]H01R23/68, H01R13/405, H01R23/72, H01R13/41
Former International [1995/26]H01R23/68, H01R13/405
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/26]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder für die Montage auf einer Druckschaltungsplatte[1995/42]
English:Electrical connector for mounting on a printed circuit board[1995/26]
French:Connecteur électrique pour montage sur une plaquette à circuit imprimé[1995/26]
Former [1995/26]Elektrischer Verbinder für die Montage auf einer gedrückten Schaltung
Examination procedure02.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/27]
18.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0193289  (CRANE ELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 12, line 10 - page 13, line 8 * * page 16, line 14 - page 17, line 7; figures 1,3-8 *;
 [X]US4663815  (HARTMAN JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 8; figures 3-9 *;
 [X]US3838316  (POROD R, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 56; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]DE3414343  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3414323  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3697933  (BLACK RICHARD W, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 4 - line 11; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US4217024  (ALDRIDGE LIONEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,5,6 *;
 [A]US5137454  (BAECHTLE DAVID R [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 6, line 36 - line 39; figure 5 *