Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0661320

EP0661320 - Process for coating substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/27]Aqueous coating and its use in coating substrates
[1999/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co. KG
Christbusch 25
42285 Wuppertal / DE
Former [1995/27]For all designated states
Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Christbusch 25
D-42285 Wuppertal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mass, Manfred
Viktorstrasse 11
D-42275 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Kerber, Herrmann
Daniel-Schürmann-Weg 37
D-42369 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Stegen, Helga
Berliner Strasse 144
D-42277 Wuppertal / DE
[1995/27]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/27]Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date94120192.320.12.1994
[1995/27]
Priority number, dateDE1993434402823.12.1993         Original published format: DE 4344028
[1995/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0661320
Date:05.07.1995
Language:DE
[1995/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0661320
Date:20.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.1995
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/62, C09D175/04
[1995/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/27]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Substraten[2000/38]
English:Process for coating substrates[2000/38]
French:Procédé pour revêtir des substrats[2000/38]
Former [1995/27]Wässriges Überzugsmittel und dessen Verwendung bei Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Substraten
Former [1995/27]Aqueous coating and its use in coating substrates
Former [1995/27]Revêtement aqueux et son utilisation pour revêtir des substrats
Examination procedure03.08.1995Examination requested  [1995/39]
15.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
12.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
31.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2000Fee for grant paid
27.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0520627  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 5, line 12 - page 11, line 10; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]US4444954  (MELS SHERMAN J [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 39 - column 5, line 19; example 8; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4683173  (ABBEY KIRK J [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 26 - line 34; claim - *