blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0661028 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0661028



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 223
21.12.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
21.12.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.1994 Description Search / examination 16
21.12.1994 Claims Search / examination 4
21.12.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.04.1995 European search report Search / examination 3
20.04.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.05.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 41
22.05.1995 Priority document Search / examination 32
22.05.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.05.1995 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
02.06.1995 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
08.12.1995 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
04.11.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
10.03.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.03.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.05.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 16
15.05.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.05.2000 Claims Search / examination 11
29.09.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.09.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.02.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
09.02.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
09.02.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
09.02.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
27.02.2001 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
27.02.2001 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
10.04.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.04.2001 Description Search / examination 8
10.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
19.11.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
19.11.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.11.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.03.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.03.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.04.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
23.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.08.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.07.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1