blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0661028


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.08.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.09.2003  [2003/38]
09.08.2002 (Expected) grant published on  25.09.2002  [2002/39]
02.08.2002 Change - classification published on  18.09.2002  [2002/38]
02.08.2002 Change - classification published on  18.09.2002  [2002/38]
09.05.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant
28.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.01.2002 Renewal fee
14.11.2001 Communication of intention to grant
17.04.2001 Examination report or reply
22.02.2001 Examination report or reply
21.02.2001 Examination report or reply
11.01.2001 Renewal fee
26.09.2000 Examination report or reply
17.05.2000 Examination report or reply
15.03.2000 Examination report or reply
17.01.2000 Renewal fee
05.11.1999 First examination report
29.10.1999 Examination report or reply
13.01.1999 Renewal fee
15.01.1998 Renewal fee
10.01.1997 Renewal fee
23.05.1995 Change - representative published on  12.07.1995 [1995/28]
19.05.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.07.1995 [1995/27]
19.05.1995 Request for examination filed published on  05.07.1995 [1995/27]