blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0661028
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2717497BGlobal Dossier 18.02.1998B2
JPH07194640 01.08.1995A
Priority number Date
JP35200093 28.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0661028Global Dossier 25.09.2002B1
EP0661028 05.07.1995A1
Priority number Date
JP35200093 28.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69431425D 31.10.2002D1
Priority number Date
JP35200093 28.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69431425T 23.01.2003T2
Priority number Date
JP35200093 28.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2180557T 16.02.2003T3
Priority number Date
JP35200093 28.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5878747 09.03.1999A
Priority number Date
JP35200093 28.12.1993