Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0661028

EP0661028 - Condom coated with acidic polysaccarides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Latex Co., Ltd
19-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Fuji Latex Co., Ltd
19-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Former [1995/27]For all designated states
Fuji Latex Co., Ltd
19-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Enomoto, Yutaka, c/o Fuji Latex Co., Ltd.
19-1, Kanda, Nishiki-cho 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Fujii, Masahiko
4-10-1, Iwato-Minami
Komae-shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / Furusho, Takao
1-6-13, Asahi-machi
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
04 / Yamamoto, Naoki
3-11-17-501, Ebisu-Minami
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1995/27]
Representative(s)Boeters, Hans Dietrich , et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15
D-81541 München / DE
Former [1995/27]Boeters, Hans D. Dr.
Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date94120270.721.12.1994
[1995/27]
Priority number, dateJP1993035200028.12.1993         Original published format: JP 35200093
[1995/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0661028
Date:05.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0661028
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61L31/10, C08L5/00, A61F6/04
[2002/38]
Former International [1995/27]A61F6/04, A61K31/73, A61K35/66
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/27]
TitleGerman:Mit sauren Polysacchariden beschichtetes Kondom[1995/27]
English:Condom coated with acidic polysaccarides[1995/27]
French:Préservatif ayant un revêtement de polysaccharides acides[1995/27]
Examination procedure21.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/27]
04.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2002Fee for grant paid
25.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US5165953  (SHLENKER ROBIN R T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,12,14,15 * claims 1-23 *;
 [XY]EP0292220  (UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUJO KK [JP]) [X] 1,11-13 * claims 1-7 * * page 3, line 23 - line 37 * [Y] 2-10;
 [Y]EP0295956  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * claims 1-24 *;
 [D]JPS63316731  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD);
 [Y]EP0295961  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4-7 * claims 1-35 *;
 [D]JPS63316726  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD);
 [Y]EP0331821  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 8 * claims 1-10 *;
 [D]JPH01199593  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD);
 [Y]EP0295955  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9 * claims 1-20 *;
 [D]JPS63316730  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD);
 [Y]EP0319676  (LUITPOLD WERK CHEM PHARM [DE]) [Y] 10 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0427997  (GERMO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *