Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0659940

EP0659940 - Floating breakwater having improved wave impact stability [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PATENTWERKE A.G.
Städtle, 36
9490 Vaduz / LI
[2000/16]
Former [1995/26]For all designated states
PATENTWERKE A.G.
Städtle, 36
FL-9490 Vaduz / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Buongiorno, Giuseppe
Via Brunelleschi 2
I-20146 Milano / IT
[1995/26]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1995/26]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
I-20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date94120341.621.12.1994
[1995/26]
Priority number, dateIT1993MI0269221.12.1993         Original published format: IT MI932692
[1995/26]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0659940
Date:28.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0659940
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.1995
ClassificationInternational:E02B3/06
[1995/26]
Designated contracting statesCH,   FR,   LI [1995/26]
TitleGerman:Treibender Wellenbrecher mit verbesserter Schlagfestigkeit gegen Wellen[1995/26]
English:Floating breakwater having improved wave impact stability[1995/26]
French:Brise-lames flottant ayant un stabilité améliorée contre l'impact des vagues[1995/26]
Examination procedure29.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/04]
17.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.1999Fee for grant paid
05.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.01.199804   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.1998
31.12.199906   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US3991576  (TAZAKI SANDANORI, et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 56 - line 59; figures 7-9 * * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 8 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 6,7;
 [Y]DE2222750  (KOPPERS CO INC) [Y] 6,7 * page 4; figure - *;
 [A]US4406564  (HANSON RAYMOND A [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]GB2065569  (HARRIS A J) [A] 1 * abstract *