EP0661686 - Display control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsunoda, Takashi, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takagi, Yuichi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120758.1 | 27.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | JP19930337378 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33737893 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0661686 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0661686 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661686 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/18 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
G09G5/008 (EP,US);
G09G5/366 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | Anzeigesteuergerät | [1995/27] | English: | Display control apparatus | [1995/27] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'affichage | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.03.2000 | IT | 08.03.2000 | NL | 08.03.2000 | SE | 08.03.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | ES | 08.03.2000 | |
NL | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 08.03.2000 | |
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 08.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH039615 ; | [A]JPS62256521 ; | [A]US5185603 (MEDIN DAVID L [US]) [A] 1,3-6 * column 5, line 13 - column 8, line 51; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0544245 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,3-6 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 14; figures 2-4 *; | [PA]EP0622775 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1-3,5-8,10-13* column 6, line 52 - column 9, line 50; figures 2-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910325), vol. 15, no. 121, Database accession no. (E - 1049), & JP03009615 A 19910117 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,3-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880421), vol. 12, no. 130, Database accession no. (E - 603), & JP62256521 A 19871109 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [A] 1,3-6 * abstract * |