Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0669354

EP0669354 - Process for the preparation of polyaddition products containing uretdione groups and their use in polyurethane-lacquer systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2001 [2001/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/41]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1995/35]For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-45764 Marl / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gras, Rainer, Dr.
Im Ostholz 49 a
D-44879 Bochum / DE
02 / Brandt, Siegfried, Dr.
An der Mühlenstege 35
D-45721 Haltern / DE
03 / Behrendt, Klaus
Schüchtermannstrasse 133
D-44628 Herne / DE
04 / Herda, Silvia
Grenzweg 10
D-44623 Herne / DE
[1995/35]
Application number, filing date94120893.629.12.1994
[1995/35]
Priority number, dateDE1994440644528.02.1994         Original published format: DE 4406445
[1995/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0669354
Date:30.08.1995
Language:DE
[1995/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0669354
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/79, C08G18/80, C07D229/00
[1995/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1995/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von uretdiongruppenhaltigen Polyadditionsprodukten und deren Verwendung in Polyurethan-Lacksystemen[1995/35]
English:Process for the preparation of polyaddition products containing uretdione groups and their use in polyurethane-lacquer systems[1995/35]
French:Procédé de préparation de produits de polyaddition contenant des groupes uretdione et leur utilisation dans des systèmes de vernis de polyuréthane[1995/35]
Examination procedure12.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/36]
07.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2000Fee for grant paid
18.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0033927  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,4,5 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 27 * * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 9 *;
 [A]EP0519734  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3,7 *;
 [A]BE571279  (BAYER) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 * * page 2, line 11 - line 57 * * page 3, line 22 - line 27 *;
 [A]EP0045996  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 * * page 3, line 4 - line 39 *;
 [D]DE3030572  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]);
 [A]FR2298566  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3,7 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 34 * * page 7, line 9 - line 32 * * example 2 *