Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0651259

EP0651259 - Method and apparatus for measuring modulation acccuracy of a transmitted signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/18]Method and apparatus for measuring modulation acccuracy and a transmitted signal
[1999/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001Change - applicantpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [1995/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Birgenheier, Raymond A.
W. 416 Jefferson Court
Spokane, Washington 99203 / US
02 / Ryan, Richard P.
12505 E. 23rd
Spokane, Washington 99206 / US
[1995/28]
Former [1995/18]01 / Birgenheier, Raymond A.
W. 416 Jefferson Court
Spokane, Washington 99203 / US
02 / Ryan, Richard P.
E. 11412 25th Street
Spokane, Washington 99206 / US
Representative(s)Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/18]Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date94120935.511.01.1990
[1995/18]
Priority number, dateUS1989029735713.01.1989         Original published format: US 297357
[1995/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0651259
Date:03.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0651259
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:G01R29/26, H04L1/20, G01R25/00
[1995/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1995/39]
Former [1995/18]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung zum Messen der Modulationsgenauigkeit eines übertragenen Signals[1995/18]
English:Method and apparatus for measuring modulation acccuracy of a transmitted signal[1999/06]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer la précision de modulation d'un signal transmis[1995/18]
Former [1995/18]Method and apparatus for measuring modulation acccuracy and a transmitted signal
Examination procedure31.01.1995Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.05.1995Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR, IT, SE
09.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/49]
25.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.1999Fee for grant paid
27.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP90300303.6  / EP0378405
Opposition(s)09.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
18.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
22.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
13.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.02.1995FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.02.1995IT   M01   Not yet paid
15.02.1995SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0238906  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,14 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2176977  (ROBINTON PROD INC) [A] 1,5,6,14 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0295160  (ALCATEL ESPACE [FR], et al) [A] 7,11 * page 3, line 39 - line 65; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0273504  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *
 [XA]  EVANS, "PSK SIGNAL QUALITY ESTIMATES FOR NETWORK CONTROL", 1985 IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONF. MILCOM '85, BOSTON, MA, USA, (19851023), vol. 2, pages 480 - 484, [X] 1,4,5 * page 483, column L, paragraph 2 - page 484, column L; figures 4,5 * [A] 3,7,14
 [A]  RAUCHENECKER ET AL., "NEUE MESSGERÄTEGENERATION FÜR DIGITALÜBERTRAGUNGSEINRICHTUNGEN", TELCOM REPORT, MUNCHEN DE, (198703), vol. 10, pages 267 - 274,