Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0620605 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0620605



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 721
15.02.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
01.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.01.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 15
18.12.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
10.12.2007 Change of composition of the board in case of an extended board Appeal 1
10.12.2007 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 4
08.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 6
13.09.2007 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
08.09.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
08.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.09.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
30.08.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.08.2007 Change of composition of the board in case of an extended board Appeal 1
26.10.2006 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
10.10.2006 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
24.05.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.05.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
19.05.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.03.2006 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
22.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.03.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.11.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.11.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.11.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
17.11.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.11.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
20.10.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 2
20.10.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
21.09.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.09.2005 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.09.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
14.07.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
14.07.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
14.07.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
14.07.2005 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
14.07.2005 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
14.07.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 17
14.07.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.07.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.04.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.03.2005 Authorisation Opposition 1
05.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
03.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
02.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
01.03.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.02.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
08.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.02.2005 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
03.02.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.01.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
27.01.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
27.01.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.01.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.01.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.01.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
19.01.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.2005 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
18.01.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.01.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.01.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.01.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.12.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.12.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.12.2004 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 6
24.12.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.12.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
21.12.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
21.12.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
21.12.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
21.12.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
21.12.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
21.12.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
21.12.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
21.12.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
21.12.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
14.12.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.12.2002 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
25.01.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.01.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.01.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 10
08.12.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.12.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.12.2001 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
05.12.2001 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
03.12.2001 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
03.12.2001 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
03.12.2001 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
29.11.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
22.11.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
22.11.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.11.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.11.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.11.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.11.2001 Authorisation Appeal 1
19.11.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
04.10.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.10.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.09.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
27.09.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
27.09.2001 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
24.09.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.05.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.11.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.11.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
19.07.1999 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
19.07.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.07.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
09.07.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
09.07.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
20.05.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.05.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.04.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.04.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
31.03.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.03.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.03.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.03.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.03.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 11
26.03.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
26.03.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
26.03.1999 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
26.03.1999 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
26.03.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 11
26.03.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.1999 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
09.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.10.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.10.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.10.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1998 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
13.10.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.06.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.06.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.06.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.06.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.06.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
15.06.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
15.06.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
04.06.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.06.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.05.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
10.05.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.04.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.04.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
31.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
25.03.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.01.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.12.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
10.12.1997 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
10.12.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
24.11.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
14.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.10.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
05.09.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.09.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.06.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Authorisation Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
03.06.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
19.09.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.05.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.05.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.05.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.04.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
25.04.1996 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 5
23.04.1996 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
04.04.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
28.03.1996 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.03.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
21.03.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
18.12.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
20.11.1995 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.10.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
14.10.1995 Description Search / examination 4
14.10.1995 Description Search / examination 4
14.10.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.09.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
26.08.1995 Claims Search / examination 1
26.08.1995 Description Search / examination 3
17.11.1994 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
07.11.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.11.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
30.05.1994 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.01.1994 Authorisation Search / examination 1
25.01.1994 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
25.01.1994 Priority document Search / examination 13
13.01.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.01.1994 Claims Search / examination 1
13.01.1994 Description Search / examination 6
13.01.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
13.01.1994 Drawings Search / examination 3
13.01.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6