blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0609927 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0609927



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 181
13.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
10.07.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
23.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
16.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
03.09.1998 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 1
14.01.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
14.01.1998 Description Search / examination 2
14.01.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.10.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.01.1995 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
05.04.1994 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
28.03.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.03.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
14.01.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.01.1994 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 12
14.01.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
14.01.1994 Description Search / examination 18
14.01.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.1994 Drawings Search / examination 4
14.01.1994 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
14.01.1994 Priority document Search / examination 27
14.01.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
14.01.1994 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 22
14.01.1994 Translation of priority document Search / examination 27