blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0609927


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.03.2001 [2001/13]
25.02.2000 (Expected) grant published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
21.12.1999 Renewal fee
08.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
15.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
06.01.1999 Renewal fee
16.10.1998 Change - name/address published on  02.12.1998 [1998/49]
16.01.1998 Examination report or reply
12.01.1998 Renewal fee
03.10.1997 First examination report
27.09.1997 Examination report or reply
21.12.1996 Renewal fee
05.01.1996 Renewal fee
21.01.1995 Request for examination filed published on  15.03.1995 [1995/11]
24.06.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.08.1994 [1994/32]