blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0609927
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2934718BGlobal Dossier 16.08.1999B2
JPH06250032 09.09.1994A
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0609927Global Dossier 12.04.2000B1
EP0609927 10.08.1994A1
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT191798T 15.04.2000T
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69423924D 18.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69423924T 05.10.2000T2
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0609927T 11.09.2000T3
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2145090T 01.07.2000T3
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GR3033876T 30.11.2000T3
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NL9300205 01.09.1994A
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT609927E 29.09.2000E
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5375178 20.12.1994A
Priority number Date
NL9300205 02.02.1993