Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0609927

EP0609927 - Integrated optical polarization manipulating device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Stationsplein 7
9726 AE Groningen / NL
[1998/49]
Former [1994/32]For all designated states
Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V.
P.O. Box 95321
NL-2509 CH The Hague / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van der Tol, Johannes Jacobus Gerardus Maria
Ruimtebaan 313
NL-2728 MP Zoetermeer / NL
[1994/32]
Application number, filing date94200080.314.01.1994
[1994/32]
Priority number, dateNL1993000020502.02.1993         Original published format: NL 9300205
[1994/32]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0609927
Date:10.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0609927
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.1994
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/12
[1994/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/32]
TitleGerman:Integriert-optische Vorrichtung zur Polarisationskontrolle[1994/32]
English:Integrated optical polarization manipulating device[1994/32]
French:Dispositif en optique intégrée pour le contrôle de polarisation[1994/32]
Examination procedure12.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/11]
02.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1999Fee for grant paid
29.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0522625  (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 51; figures 1-4B *;
 [DA]  J.J.G.M. VAN DER TOL ET AL., "A polarization splitter on LiNbO3 using only titanium diffusion", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY., NEW YORK US, (199107), vol. 9, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1109/50.85789, pages 879 - 886, XP000241871 [DA] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.85789
 [A]  J.J.G.M. VAN DER TOL ET AL., "Measurement of mode splitting in asymmetric y-junctions", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, NEW YORK US, (199205), vol. 4, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/68.136484, pages 454 - 457, XP000272642 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.136484
 [A]  K. MATSUBARA ET AL., "Y-branch TE-TM mode splitter using multilayered waveguide", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS., TOKYO JP, (199205), vol. 31, no. 5B, doi:doi:10.1143/JJAP.31.1636, pages 1636 - 1640, XP000323130 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.31.1636