Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0613328

EP0613328 - Bi-level lighting control system for HID lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1994/35]For all designated states
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Troy, Patrick
c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[1994/35]
Representative(s)Dusseldorp, Jan Charles , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1994/35]Dusseldorp, Jan Charles , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date94200415.118.02.1994
[1994/35]
Priority number, dateUS1993002353426.02.1993         Original published format: US 23534
[1994/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0613328
Date:31.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0613328
Date:05.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0613328
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:H05B41/42
[1994/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/35]
TitleGerman:Zweistufiges Beleuchtungssteuerungssystem für Starkstromentladungslampen[1994/35]
English:Bi-level lighting control system for HID lamps[1994/35]
French:Système de contrôle à deux niveaux d'éclairement pour une lampe à forte décharge[1994/35]
Examination procedure05.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/49]
16.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2000Fee for grant paid
03.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL24.05.2000
[2003/08]
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4994718  (GORDIN MYRON K [US]) [AD] 1 * column A; figures 4A,4B,5 *;
 [A]US4682083  (ALLEY ROBERT P [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 9; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0349707  (WIDE LITE INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1;
 [D]US4931701  (CARL MICHAEL J [US]) [D] * column A; figures 1-3 *