Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0624900

EP0624900 - Method of micro-machining an integrated sensor on the surface of a silicon wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2000/45]
Former [1994/46]For all designated states
DELCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
700 East Firmin Street
Kokomo Indiana 46902 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sparks, Douglas Ray
11204 Eagle Drive
Kokomo, Indiana 46901 / US
02 / Healton, Robert Lawrence
2825 South Park Road
Kokomo, Indiana 46902 / US
03 / Brown, Ronald Eugene
901 Hillsdale Drive
Kokomo, Indiana 46901 / US
04 / Christenson, John Carl
840 North 500 East
Kokomo, Indiana 46901 / US
[1994/46]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John , et al
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1994/51]Denton, Michael John , et al
Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street
Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB
Former [1994/46]Jehan, Robert
Patent Section, 1st Floor, Gideon House, 28 Chapel Street
Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB
Application number, filing date94201062.018.04.1994
[1994/46]
Priority number, dateUS1993005922210.05.1993         Original published format: US 59222
[1994/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0624900
Date:17.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0624900
Date:08.10.1997
[1997/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0624900
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/306, H01L21/76, H01L27/20, G01L9/00, G01P15/08
[1997/40]
Former International [1994/46]H01L21/76, H01L21/36
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/46]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Mikro-Bearbeiten eines in der Oberfläche eines Siliziumkörpers integrierten Sensors[2000/48]
English:Method of micro-machining an integrated sensor on the surface of a silicon wafer[1994/46]
French:Procédé pour le micro-usinage d'un capteur intégré dans la surface d'un corps en silicium[1994/46]
Former [1994/46]Verfahren zum Mikro-Bearbeiten eines in dem Oberflach eines Siliziumkörpers integrierten Sensors
Examination procedure08.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/24]
17.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2001Fee for grant paid
28.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.12.2001
GB18.04.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2003/17]GB18.04.2002
Documents cited:Search[YA]CN1055195  (LANZHOU CHEM PHYS INST [CN]) [Y] 1,3-6,12-15,23-26 [A] 9,11,16,18,19,22;
 []US5242863  (XIANG-ZHENG TU [CN], et al) [ ] * column 5, line 31 - column 8, line 15; figures 2A-3K * * column 9, line 45 - column 10, line 4 *;
 [YA]EP0539311  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1,3-6,12-15 * page 3, column 3, line 29 - page 4, column 5, line 44; figures 1A-4 * [A] 4,5,11,12,15;
 [YA]US4975390  (FUJII TETSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 23-26 * column 4, line 58 - column 7, line 15; figures 1A-4 * [A] 11,12,15,16,18-21;
 [A]US4888300  (BURTON GREGORY N [US]) [A] 1,4-7,9-12,20,22 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-9B *;
 [A]CN1058100  (TU XIANGZHENG [CN]) [A] 1,4-7;
 []US5352635  (TU XIANG-ZHENG [CN], et al) [ ] * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 65; figures 3A-I *