Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0626129

EP0626129 - A construction for milking animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2005Change - applicantpublished on 25.01.2006  [2006/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lely Enterprises AG
Bützenweg 20
6300 Zug / CH
[N/P]
Former [2006/04]For all designated states
Lely Enterprises AG
Bützenweg 20
6300 ZUG / CH
Former [1999/05]For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Former [1994/48]For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 10
NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Kakes, Gijsbert
177 A Vijverhofstraat
NL-3032 SM Rotterdam / NL
[1994/48]
Representative(s)Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Former [1994/48]Mulder, Herman , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL
Application number, filing date94201454.924.05.1994
[1994/48]
Priority number, dateNL1993000091728.05.1993         Original published format: NL 9300917
[1994/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0626129
Date:30.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0626129
Date:03.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0626129
Date:19.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1994
ClassificationInternational:A01J7/00
[1994/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1994/48]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Melken von Tieren[1994/48]
English:A construction for milking animals[1994/48]
French:Dispositif de traite d'animaux[1994/48]
Examination procedure01.06.1995Examination requested  [1995/41]
11.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.07.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.1998Fee for grant paid
16.10.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.11.1999  02.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Michael Charles
Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/15]
Opponent(s)01  02.11.1999  02.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
DeLaval International AB
P O Box 39
147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Michael Charles
Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
Former [2000/41]
Opponent(s)01  02.11.1999  02.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Alfa Laval Agri AB
P O Box 39
S-147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Michael Charles
Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
Former [2000/32]
Opponent(s)01  02.11.1999  02.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Alfa Laval Agri AB
P O Box 39
S-147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Gray, Helen Mary
Albihns GmbH Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
Former [1999/51]
Opponent(s)01  02.11.1999  02.12.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Alfa Laval Agri AB
P O Box 39
S-147 21 TUMBA / SE
Opponent's representative
Platt, Timothy Nathaniel
Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB P.O.Box 5581
S-114 85 Stockholm / SE
07.12.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.03.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.04.2000Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2000Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
24.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2001Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.03.2002Date of oral proceedings
18.04.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.04.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
12.11.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.12.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.02.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.03.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition23.05.2002Appeal received No.  T0555/02
14.08.2002Statement of grounds filed
12.11.2003Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.11.2003Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2003Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
01.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
07.07.1995M01   Fee paid on   01.08.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0385539  (VAN DER LELY) [A] 1 * column 5, line 47 - column 7, line 1 * * column 11, line 36 - column 12, line 49 * * figure -; claims 1,24-30 *;
 [A]US4222346  (REISGIES) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 38 * * figures 1,2; claims 1,6 *
ExaminationUS2730992
 EP0091892
    - Low:"Backflushing on the boil", Dairy Farmer, June 1978
    - Dunsmore et al.: "Cleaning Milking Machines unsing Non-Iodophor Systems", The Australian Journal of Dairy Technology - June 1980
    - Rider: "Windmill" Cluster Washer Beats Mastitis in Holland", Dairy Farmer, June 1992
    - Machine Milking NIRD 1977, pages 38, 39, 66-69 and 286-317
    - Bou-matic's System 2000
    - 2000 V en VM Automatic Detachers from Boumatic
    - System 2000 TM Dairy farm automation system
    - International Standard ISO 5707 Milking machine Installations - Construction and performance, 1983
    - International Standard ISO 3918 Milking machine installations - Vocabulary, 1977