Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0626129 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0626129



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 418
11.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.04.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
13.04.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 3
13.04.2004 Request for transfer of rights Opposition 1
07.04.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.04.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
02.04.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
22.03.2004 Claims Opposition 2
22.03.2004 Claims Opposition 3
22.03.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.02.2004 N/A Opposition 3
13.02.2004 N/a Opposition 2
13.01.2004 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
15.12.2003 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
11.12.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 23
27.11.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 17
17.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.10.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
15.10.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
13.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
10.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.08.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.08.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.08.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.08.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
04.08.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.03.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
03.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
03.01.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
20.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.08.2002 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.08.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
14.08.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
07.06.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.06.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
06.06.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.05.2002 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.05.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.05.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.04.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.04.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.04.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.04.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
18.04.2002 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
18.04.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
18.04.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
18.04.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.02.2002 Communication of amended entries Opposition 4
19.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.02.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
27.12.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.12.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.10.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.10.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.10.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.10.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.10.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.10.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
12.10.2001 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
12.10.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
12.10.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
01.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.05.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.05.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.05.2001 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
30.04.2001 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
26.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.02.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.02.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.10.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
24.10.2000 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
19.10.2000 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
25.08.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.08.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.08.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
21.08.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.08.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
21.08.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 22
21.08.2000 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.08.2000 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 7
19.06.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.04.2000 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
10.04.2000 Description Opposition 1
10.04.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
07.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.2000 Description Opposition 1
31.03.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
07.12.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.12.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.11.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.11.1999 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.11.1999 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.11.1999 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.11.1999 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.11.1999 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 23
05.11.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.11.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
05.11.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
02.11.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
02.11.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.12.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.10.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.10.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.10.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.10.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.07.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
07.05.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.02.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
10.02.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
26.01.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
14.10.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.1997 Description Search / examination 3
14.10.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.07.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.07.1995 Late payment of examination fee/designation fees without additional fee(s) Search / examination 1
12.10.1994 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
21.09.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.09.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
24.05.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.05.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
24.05.1994 Description Search / examination 5
24.05.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.05.1994 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.05.1994 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
24.05.1994 Priority document Search / examination 11
24.05.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
24.05.1994 Translation of priority document Search / examination 9