Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0630557

EP0630557 - A construction for automatically milking animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
[1997/45]
Former [1994/52]For all designated states
Texas Industries Inc.
15 Pietermaai
Willemstad, Curaçao / AN
Inventor(s)01 / van der Lely, Cornelis
7, Brüschenrain
CH-6300 Zug / CH
[1994/52]
Representative(s)Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Former [1997/45]Mulder, Herman , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Former [1994/52]Mulder, Herman
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL
Application number, filing date94201789.822.06.1994
[1994/52]
Priority number, dateNL1993000109924.06.1993         Original published format: NL 9301099
[1994/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0630557
Date:28.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0630557
Date:15.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0630557
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:A01J7/00
[1994/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1994/52]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum automatischen Melken von Tieren[1994/52]
English:A construction for automatically milking animals[1994/52]
French:Dispositif de traite automatique d'animaux[1994/52]
Examination procedure04.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/44]
17.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1999Fee for grant paid
29.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03076260.3  / EP1342407
EP99202283.0  / EP0951820
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2218888  (HANAUER) [X] 1,25 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 17, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-6; claims 1,9,37 *;
 [A]EP0091892  (ALFA-LAVAL) [A] 1,25 * page 4, line 33 - page 6, line 18 * * figure 1; claims 1-4,7 *;
 [A]EP0270165  (MULTINORM BV) [A] 1,25 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 10 * * column 8, line 30 - line 43 * * figures 1,9,11,12; claims 1,5 *;
 [A]EP0440313  (MULTINORM BV) [A] 1,25 * column 9, line 37 - line 42 * * column 10, line 34 - column 11, line 18 * * figure 13; claim - *