Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0633657

EP0633657 - Cascaded amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED
420-430 London Road
Croydon CR9 3QR / GB
For:DE  FR  IT 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2008/39]
Former [2000/03]For:GB 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED
420-430 London Road
Croydon CR9 3QR / GB
For:DE  FR  IT 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1995/02]For:GB 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED
420-430 London Road
Croydon CR9 3QR / GB
For:DE  FR  IT 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Moore, Paul Anthony, c/o Philips Research Lab.
Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
02 / Cusdin, Anthony Richard, c/o Philips Research Lab.
Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
[1995/02]
Representative(s)Moody, Colin James , et al
Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/40]Moody, Colin James , et al
Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Former [1995/02]Kidd, Piers Burgess
Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date94201874.829.06.1994
[1995/02]
Priority number, dateGB1993001384005.07.1993         Original published format: GB 9313840
[1995/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0633657
Date:11.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0633657
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0633657
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:H03F3/45, H03F3/347, H03G7/00
[1996/04]
Former International [1995/02]H03F3/45, H03F3/347
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/02]
TitleGerman:Verstärkerkaskade[1995/02]
English:Cascaded amplifier[1995/02]
French:Amplificateur en cascade[1995/02]
Examination procedure31.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/39]
26.02.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
31.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.03.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.1999Fee for grant paid
29.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9011645  (ANALOG DEVICES INC) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2133597  (ANALOG DEVICES INC) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [DA]  - W. L. BARBER ET AL., IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, NEW YORK US, vol. sc-15, no. 3, pages 291 - 295 [DA] 1 * the whole document *