blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0635800


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.04.1998 Withdrawal of application published on  10.06.1998 [1998/24]
30.01.1998 First examination report
26.01.1998 Examination report or reply
12.08.1997 Renewal fee
27.06.1996 Renewal fee
01.08.1995 Request for examination filed published on  20.09.1995 [1995/38]
09.12.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.01.1995 [1995/04]