blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0635800

Designated contracting statesBE 
DE 
FR 
GB 
NL 
Examination procedure14.04.1998Application withdrawn by applicant  [1998/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.01.1995 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:20.09.1995 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19950725
 
Event date:18.03.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980129
 
Event date:10.06.1998 
Event description:APPLICATION WITHDRAWN
[DO NOT USE]:19980414