Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0635800

EP0635800 - System and device for the transfer of vehicle data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.04.1998
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.1998Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.06.1998 [1998/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Stationsplein 7
9726 AE Groningen / NL
[N/P]
Former [1995/04]For all designated states
Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V.
P.O. Box 95321
NL-2509 CH The Hague / NL
Inventor(s)01 / De Haas, Jacobus Johannes
Karpaten 53
NL-2264 ME Leidschendam / NL
02 / Kerling, Frank Martin
Prinses Annalaan 466
NL-2263 XW Leidschendam / NL
[1995/04]
Application number, filing date94202098.319.07.1994
[1995/04]
Priority number, dateNL1993000130123.07.1993         Original published format: NL 9301301
[1995/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0635800
Date:25.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/00, G07C5/00, G08G1/127, G06F17/60, G06K17/00
[1995/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1995/04]
TitleGerman:System und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Fahrzeugdaten[1995/04]
English:System and device for the transfer of vehicle data[1995/04]
French:Système et dispositif de transmission de données de véhicules[1995/04]
Examination procedure25.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/38]
29.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.1998Application withdrawn by applicant  [1998/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]FR2667554  (PARIENTI RAOUL) [DA] 1-4,10,11 * page 1, line 12 - line 16 * * page 2, line 7 - line 9 * * page 3, line 4 - line 6 * * page 3, line 29 - line 31 * * claim 1 *;
 [DA]GB2192665  (NEIMAN SECURITY PRODUCTS LIMIT) [DA] 1,4,8,10,11 * page 1, line 62 - line 71 * * page 2, line 70 - line 73 *;
 [DA]FR2647930  (CGA HBS [FR]) [DA] 1 * page 8, line 21 - line 25 *;
 [A]US4398172  (CARROLL ROBERT J, et al) [A] 1,11,12 * claim 7 *;
 [A]GB2169173  (EMX INT LTD) [A] 1,4,8-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0383593  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,9 * claim 14 *;
 [A]WO9012365  (AUTO I D INC [US]) [A] 7,8 * claim 13 *;
 [A]US4897642  (DILULLO JOSEPH V [US], et al) [A] 9 * column 2, line 30 - line 33 * * claim 32 *