blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0638696

EP0638696 - Roofcovering material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Modiglass Modified Asphalt- and Glassmatmachines Ltd.
Bahnhofstrasse 27
6301 Zug / CH
[N/P]
Former [1995/07]For all designated states
MODIGLASS MODIFIED ASPHALT- AND GLASSMATMACHINES LTD
Bahnhofstrasse 27
Zug / CH
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
[2000/01]
Former [1995/07]01 / Muelbeck, Martin
A-5222 Pfaffstaedt 10 / AT
Representative(s)Koomen, M.J.I.
Kennemerstraatweg 35
1814 GB Alkmaar / NL
[N/P]
Former [1995/07]Koomen, M.J.I.
Kennemerstraatweg 35-37
NL-1814 GB Alkmaar / NL
Application number, filing date94202256.704.08.1994
[1995/07]
Priority number, dateNL1993000136806.08.1993         Original published format: NL 9301368
[1995/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0638696
Date:15.02.1995
Language:EN
[1995/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0638696
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.1994
ClassificationIPC:E04D5/12
[1995/07]
CPC:
E04D5/12 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/07]
Extension statesSI07.11.1994
TitleGerman:Dachdeckungsmaterial[1995/07]
English:Roofcovering material[1995/07]
French:Matériau de couverture[1995/07]
Examination procedure11.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/27]
29.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
28.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.1999Fee for grant paid
22.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.02.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Request for further processing for:28.02.2000Request for further processing filed
28.02.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.04.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199906   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE31.05.2000
GR31.05.2000
IE04.08.2000
LU04.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
PT31.08.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]BE31.05.2000
GR31.05.2000
IE04.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
PT31.08.2000
Former [2002/42]BE31.05.2000
IE04.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
PT31.08.2000
Former [2001/50]BE31.05.2000
IE04.08.2000
PT31.08.2000
Former [2001/16]BE31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
Former [2001/11]BE31.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]GB923635  (SCHULLER SERVICES LTD) [X] 1 * page 2, line 46 - line 87; figure - *;
 [A]FR1560512  (STRATI FRANCE) [A] 1 * page 1, column 2, paragraph L - page 2, column 1, paragraph 1; figure . *;
 [YA]FR2364116  (SIPLAST SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [Y] 2,9,12 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 27; figure - * [A] 13-15;
 [A]FR2478709  (SIPLAST [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 30; figure - *;
 [A]FR2556392  (RUETGERSWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0145064  (MODIGLASS MODIFIED ASPHALT [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4588458  (PREVISANI MARIO [IT]) [A] 1* column A; figure - *;
 [XAY]EP0251374  (MODIGLASS MODIFIED ASPHALT [CH]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,11,17-26 * abstract * [A] 6,10,13-16 [Y] 2,9,12
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.