Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0640842

EP0640842 - Magnetic resonance apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2008/39]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1995/09]For all designated states
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Loos, Albertus L.J.G.M., c/o INT.OCTROOIBUREAU BV
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / Selder, Otto R.A.M., c/o INT.OCTROOIBUREAU BV
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[1995/09]
Representative(s)Bakker, Hendrik
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Bakker, Hendrik
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1995/09]Veenstra, Gustaaf
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date94202369.819.08.1994
[1995/09]
Priority number, dateBE1993000086624.08.1993         Original published format: BE 9300866
[1995/09]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0640842
Date:01.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0640842
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1994
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/28, G01R33/58, A61B19/00, A61B5/055
[1995/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1995/09]
TitleGerman:Apparat zur Durchführung magnetischer Resonanzverfahren[2000/08]
English:Magnetic resonance apparatus[1995/09]
French:Appareil à résonance magnétique[1995/09]
Former [1995/09]Apparat mittels magnetischer Resonanz
Examination procedure01.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/44]
19.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2001Fee for grant paid
20.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR16.05.2001
NL16.05.2001
[2006/14]
Former [2003/08]NL16.05.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/18]FR21.12.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3831278  (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 8, line 1 - column 10, line 33; figures 5-8,11 *;
 [AD]US5155435  (KAUFMAN LEON [US], et al) [AD] 1,8 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 68 *;
 [A]EP0176353  (SOUTHWEST RES INST [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 4 - page 10, line 18 *;
 [A]EP0105220  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 31 *;
 [XP]DE4325206  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [XP] 1-7 * column 1, line 3 - column 4, line 8 * * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 19; figures 1-8 *;
 [XP]US5242455  (SKEENS JOSEPH L [US], et al) [XP] 1 * column 2, line 54 - column 5, line 15 * * column 10, line 64 - column 12, line 26; figures 1-3,5 *
 [A]  - M. KOMU ET AL., "BREAST COIL DESIGN FOR LOW-FIELD MRI", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE., DULUTH,MN US, (19920901), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 165 - 170, XP000297607 [A] 1 * the whole document *