Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0660269

EP0660269 - Method for enhancing franking machines security [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2001
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.10.2001 [2001/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co.
Triftweg 21-26
16547 Birkenwerder / DE
[1996/27]
Former [1995/26]For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH
Triftweg 21-26
D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wagner, Andreas
Admiralstrasse 15
D-10999 Berlin / DE
02 / Windel, Harald
Laubacherstrasse 2
D-14197 Berlin / DE
03 / Reisinger, Frank
Schönwalderstrasse 2
D-13347 Berlin / DE
04 / Freytag, Claus
Galvanistrasse 8
D-10587 Berlin / DE
05 / Bischoff, Enno
Osnabrückerstrasse 26
D-10589 Berlin / DE
06 / Kubatzki, Ralf
Prenzlauer Promenade 23
D-13086 Berlin / DE
07 / Rieckhoff, Peter, Dr.
Levetzowstrasse 23a
D-10555 Berlin / DE
08 / Hansel, Marcus
Stresemannstrasse 74
D-10963 Berlin / DE
09 / Günther, Stephan
Forstweg 63a
D-13465 Berlin / DE
[1995/26]
Application number, filing date94250223.809.09.1994
[1995/26]
Priority number, dateDE1993434447621.12.1993         Original published format: DE 4344476
[1995/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0660269
Date:28.06.1995
Language:DE
[1995/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0660269
Date:06.09.1995
Language:DE
[1995/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0660269
Date:25.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/04
[1995/26]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1995/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Sicherheit von Frankiermaschinen[1995/26]
English:Method for enhancing franking machines security[1995/26]
French:Procédé pour améliorer la sécurité de machines à affrauchir[1995/26]
Examination procedure12.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/50]
08.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.1999Fee for grant paid
29.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99250339.1  / EP0969421
EP99250340.9  / EP0969422
EP99250341.7  / EP0969423
Opposition(s)26.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4347506  (DUWEL EDWARD C, et al) [Y] 1 * figures 1,9; claim 1 * [A] 2-74;
 [YDA]US4812965  (TAYLOR MICHAEL P [US]) [Y,D] 1 * column 2, line 40 - line 55; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 2-74;
 [A]EP0194660  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-74 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]US4549281  (ECKERT ALTON B [US], et al) [AD] 1-74 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]GB2233937  (PITNEY BOWES PLC [GB]) [AD] 1-74 * figure 1; claim 1 *