blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0660270

EP0660270 - Method and device for generating and checking security imprints [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia AG & Co. KG
Triftweg 21-26
16547 Birkenwerder / DE
[2002/28]
Former [1996/27]For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co.
Triftweg 21-26
16547 Birkenwerder / DE
Former [1995/26]For all designated states
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH
Triftweg 21-26
D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Windel, Harald
Laubacher Strasse 2
D-14197 Berlin / DE
02 / Thiel, Wolfgang, Dr.
Bohnsackersteig 8
D-13503 Berlin / DE
[1995/26]
Representative(s)Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstraße 31
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert
Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
Former [2001/11]Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn
Mauerkircherstrasse 31
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date94250259.219.10.1994
[1995/26]
Priority number, dateDE1993434447121.12.1993         Original published format: DE 4344471
[1995/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0660270
Date:28.06.1995
Language:DE
[1995/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0660270
Date:06.09.1995
Language:DE
[1995/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0660270
Date:29.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.1995
ClassificationIPC:G07B17/04
[1995/26]
CPC:
G07B17/00193 (EP,US); G07B17/00435 (EP,US); G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B17/00733 (EP,US); G07B2017/00161 (EP,US); G07B2017/00258 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00443 (EP,US); G07B2017/0058 (EP,US); G07B2017/00588 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00604 (EP,US); G07B2017/00645 (EP,US); G07B2017/00701 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00709 (EP,US); G07B2017/00741 (EP,US); G07B2017/0075 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0079 (EP,US); G07B2017/0083 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1995/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung zur Erzeugung und Überprüfung eines Sicherheitsabdruckes[1995/26]
English:Method and device for generating and checking security imprints[1995/26]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour générer et vérifier un motif destiné à la sécurité[1995/26]
Examination procedure12.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/50]
08.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
08.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2004Fee for grant paid
09.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination17.01.2001Appeal received No.  T0509/01
29.03.2001Statement of grounds filed
07.09.2001Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)EP01250022.9  / EP1118964
EP01250023.7  / EP1113403
Opposition(s)30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
05.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YA]GB2188880  (PITNEY BOWES INC) [Y] 1,12,20-22,67 * column 2, line 40 - line 82; figures 1,3A; claim 1 * [A] 13-19,23-66,68;
 [YDA]US4812965  (TAYLOR MICHAEL P [US]) [YD] 1,12,20-22 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 15; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 13-19,23-68;
 [YDA]EP0540291  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [YD] 67 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 14; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1-66,68;
 [A]GB2211144  (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-68 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [AD]US4775246  (EDELMANN GEORGE B [US], et al) [AD] 1-68 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [AD]US4641346  (CLARK JOHN I [US], et al) [AD] 1-68 * figure 1; claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.