Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0608092

EP0608092 - Apparatuses and methods for scalable encoding and decoding of video signalss [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/30]Apparatus for scalable encoding and decoding of a digital video signal
[1999/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1994/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1994/30]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Seng, Boon Choong
416 Shatomorioka, 4-2-5, Touda-cyo
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570 / JP
[1994/30]
Representative(s)Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/30]Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date94300306.117.01.1994
[1994/30]
Priority number, dateJP1993000896922.01.1993         Original published format: JP 896993
[1994/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0608092
Date:27.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0608092
Date:15.05.1996
[1996/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0608092
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/01, H04N7/26, H04N5/44
[1996/18]
Former International [1994/30]H04N7/01
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/30]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtungungen und Verfahren zur skalierbaren Kodierung und Dekodierung von Videosignalen[1999/19]
English:Apparatuses and methods for scalable encoding and decoding of video signalss[1999/19]
French:Appareils et méthodes pour le codage et le décodage cadrable des signaux de vidéo[1999/19]
Former [1994/30]Vorrichtung zur skalierbaren Kodierung und Dekodierung digitaler Videosignale
Former [1994/30]Apparatus for scalable encoding and decoding of a digital video signal
Former [1994/30]Appareil pour le codage et le décodage cadrable des signaux numériques de vidéo
Examination procedure08.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/03]
07.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.1999Fee for grant paid
24.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199603   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.1996
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0502693  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,5,6 * column 1, line 38 - column 2 * * column 7, line 23 - line 57 *;
 [A]EP0266079  (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 36 *;
 [A]EP0484844  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 7 - column 7 *;
 [DA]GB2184628  (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP) [DA] 1-8 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 108 *;
 [Y]  DELOGNE ET AL., "Compatible Coding of Digital Interlaced HDTV", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATION, NEW YORK US, (199301), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 146 - 151, XP000378006 [Y] 1,5,6 * page 148, column 2, line 43 - page 150, column 2, line 50 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.210553
 [PA]  MORRISON ET AL., "A spatially layered hierarchical approach to video coding", SIGNAL PROCESSING IMAGE COMMUNICATION., AMSTERDAM NL, (199312), vol. 5, no. 5/6, pages 445 - 462, XP000426716 [PA] 1-8 * page 449, column 1, line 12 - page 455, column 2, line 14 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(93)90009-I