Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0609004 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0609004



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 612
16.03.2005 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
08.02.2005 Claims Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Claims Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
04.11.2004 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
04.11.2004 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
04.11.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
28.10.2004 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
27.07.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.07.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
12.07.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 2
12.07.2004 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.07.2004 Text intended for grant Opposition 8
06.07.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
05.07.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 3
29.06.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 24
28.06.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 2
12.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.03.2004 Description Opposition 3
02.03.2004 Description Opposition 6
02.03.2004 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
27.10.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
27.10.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
27.10.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 4
18.09.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
10.09.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.09.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.05.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.05.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.05.2003 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 30
16.05.2003 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 6
29.04.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.04.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.04.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
15.04.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.04.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
17.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
18.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.02.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.02.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.02.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
22.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.01.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.01.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.01.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
02.01.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.12.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
30.12.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
30.12.2002 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
20.12.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.07.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
25.10.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.10.2001 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
22.10.2001 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
15.10.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.10.2001 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
15.10.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
15.10.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
27.03.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
28.11.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.11.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
17.04.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.04.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
13.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.12.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
30.11.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
29.11.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.11.1999 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
15.11.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
27.10.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
04.08.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
02.08.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.07.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.07.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.07.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
27.07.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.07.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
27.07.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.07.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
26.07.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
14.05.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.05.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.04.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.03.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.03.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.03.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.03.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.03.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 10
18.03.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
18.03.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
18.03.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
18.03.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 15
18.03.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.1999 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
11.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
05.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
04.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
04.02.1999 Claims Opposition 2
04.02.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.02.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.02.1999 Claims Opposition 2
03.02.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
03.02.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
21.12.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.12.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.12.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
10.12.1998 Claims Opposition 2
10.12.1998 Claims Opposition 2
10.12.1998 Claims Opposition 2
10.12.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.12.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
23.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.11.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.11.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.11.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.10.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.10.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.10.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
26.10.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
26.10.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
15.10.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.10.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.10.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.10.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.09.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.08.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.08.1998 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
19.08.1998 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
26.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.06.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.06.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.02.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.02.1998 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.01.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.12.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
22.12.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
22.12.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
22.12.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.12.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.12.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.12.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.10.1997 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
06.10.1997 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
27.09.1997 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.09.1997 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
05.03.1997 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
27.02.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.02.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.02.1997 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.11.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.11.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.11.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
25.09.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
16.09.1996 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.08.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
13.08.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
30.07.1996 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
23.07.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
23.07.1996 Description Search / examination 2
23.07.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.05.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.05.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.01.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.12.1994 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
06.05.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.05.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
22.03.1994 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.03.1994 Priority document Search / examination 12
22.03.1994 Translation of priority document Search / examination 12
18.01.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.01.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
18.01.1994 Description Search / examination 13
18.01.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
18.01.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6