Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0614322

EP0614322 - Directory structure for large scale telecommunications network allowing location of roaming mobile subscribers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1994/40]
Former [1994/36]For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hoogeveen, Jacobus
Regentesselaan 4
NL-3744 MB Baarn / NL
[1994/36]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/36]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date94300405.119.01.1994
[1994/36]
Priority number, dateUS1993000775121.01.1993         Original published format: US 7751
[1994/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0614322
Date:07.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0614322
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[1999/47]
Former International [1994/36]H04Q7/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1994/36]
TitleGerman:Verzeichnisstruktur für ein grossflächiges Telekommunikationsnetzwerk für die Lokalisierung mobiler Teilnehmer[1994/36]
English:Directory structure for large scale telecommunications network allowing location of roaming mobile subscribers[1994/36]
French:Structure répertoire pour un réseau de télécommunication à grande échelle, permettant la localisation d'abonnés mobiles[1994/36]
Examination procedure23.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/17]
25.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.1999Fee for grant paid
15.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES05.04.2000
IT05.04.2000
NL05.04.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2003/08]ES05.04.2000
NL05.04.2000
Former [2002/26]ES05.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9313631  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [PX] 1 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 13 * * page 6, line 30 - page 15, line 29; figure - *
 [X]  - FUJIOKA, "Hierachical and Distributed Information Handling for UPT", IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK US, (199011), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 50 - 60, XP000172742 [X] 1-9 * page 53, column R, line 13 - page 54, column R, line 13; figures 6,7; table III *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.60735
 [X]  - C. WANG ET AL., "Performance Evaluation of a Hierachical Location Registration and Call Routing for Personal Communications", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS '92, CHICAGO,US, (199206), vol. 3, pages 1722 - 1726 [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [03.1] *
 [X]  - MALYAN ET AL., "A Microcelluluar Interconnection Arechitecture For Personal Communications networks", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY SOCIETY 42ND VTS CONFERENCE, ORLANDO, US, (199205), vol. 1, pages 502 - 505 [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0III] *