Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0612039

EP0612039 - Method and system of preventive maintenance for plant component parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/34]Maintenance systems for degradation of plant component parts
[1999/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2000
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.10.2000 [2000/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BABCOCK-HITACHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
6-2, 2-chome, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]For all designated states
BABCOCK-HITACHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
6-2, 2-chome, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [1994/34]For all designated states
BABCOCK-HITACHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
6-2, 2-chome, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamauchi, Kiyoshi, Kure Research Lab.
Babcock-Hitachi K.K., 3-36, Takaramachi
Kure-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP
02 / Hattori, Shigeo, Hitachi Works
Hitachi, Ltd., 1-1, Saiwaicho 3-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaragi-ken / JP
03 / Shindo, Takenori, Kure Works
Babcock-Hitachi K.K., 6-9, Takaramachi
Kure-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP
[1994/34]
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/34]Jenkins, Peter David , et al
PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date94301049.614.02.1994
[1994/34]
Priority number, dateJP1993002563315.02.1993         Original published format: JP 2563393
JP1993003086319.02.1993         Original published format: JP 3086393
JP1993003205922.02.1993         Original published format: JP 3205993
[1994/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0612039
Date:24.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0612039
Date:13.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0612039
Date:27.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:G07C3/00
[1994/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   SE [1994/34]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur präventiven Wartung von Anlagenbauteilen[1999/04]
English:Method and system of preventive maintenance for plant component parts[1999/04]
French:Procédé et système de maintenance préventive pour des composants d'une installation[1999/04]
Former [1994/34]Wartungssysteme zum Vermeiden von Schäden an Anlagenbauteilen
Former [1994/34]Maintenance systems for degradation of plant component parts
Former [1994/34]Systèmes de maintenance pour éviter la dégradation des composants d'une installation
Examination procedure27.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/13]
16.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.1999Fee for grant paid
16.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0517238  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 21; figure 20; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPS6469942  ;
 [A]EP0205764  (COMBUSTION ENG [US]) [A] 1-9 * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [AD]JPH04305155  ;
 [AD]US4992232  (COWAN II ROBERT L [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * figure 1; claim 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890629), vol. 013, no. 284, Database accession no. (P - 892), & JP01069942 A 19890315 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930315), vol. 017, no. 122, Database accession no. (P - 1501), & JP04305155 A 19921028 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK;OTHERS: 01) [AD] 1-9 * abstract *