Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0617562

EP0617562 - Apparatus and method for playing back continuous data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2001 [2001/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Former [1995/01]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
Former [1994/39]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Imai, Toru, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Mizoguchi, Hiroshi, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Yamaguchi, Koji, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Tanaka, Hisako, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1994/39]
Representative(s)Waldren, Robin Michael , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/39]Waldren, Robin Michael , et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date94301748.311.03.1994
[1994/39]
Priority number, dateJP1993005347115.03.1993         Original published format: JP 5347193
JP1993032732624.12.1993         Original published format: JP 32732693
[1994/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0617562
Date:28.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0617562
Date:10.04.1996
[1996/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0617562
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/15, G11B31/00, G11B27/028, G11B27/031, G11B27/28, G06F3/033
[1996/12]
Former International [1994/39]H04N7/15, G11B31/00, G11B27/028, G11B27/031
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/39]
TitleGerman:Gerät und Verfahren zur Wiedergabe von kontinuierlichen Daten[1994/39]
English:Apparatus and method for playing back continuous data[1994/39]
French:Appareil et méthode pour la reproduction de données continues[1994/39]
Examination procedure23.03.1994Examination requested  [1994/39]
03.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2000Fee for grant paid
12.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0495612  (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-9,17-19,25,26 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 16; figure 3 *;
 [X]US4841387  (RINDFUSS DIANE J [US]) [X] 1-9,11,13,15,17-19,25,26 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 63 * * column 8, line 40 - line 65 * * column 9, line 51 - line 54 * * column 12, line 56 - line 66; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US4425586  (MILLER RICHARD L [US]) [X] 1,5-8,13,15,17,26 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 7; figure 1 *;
 [XA]US4924387  (JEPPESEN JOHN C [US]) [X] 17,20 * column 7, line 13 - line 41 * * column 10, line 4 - line 48; figure 6 * [A] 1,7-10,14;
 [A]WO8911693  (WANG LABORATORIES [US]) [A] 1,10,17,20 * page 10, line 36 - page 13, line 10 *
by applicantEP0495612
 US4841387
 US4425586