Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0622930

EP0622930 - Application sharing for computer collaboration system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2001
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2001 [2001/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR International, Inc.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton
Ohio 45479 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/23]For all designated states
NCR International, Inc.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Former [1994/44]For all designated states
AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pommier, Theresa M.
126 S. Wilmette
Westmont, IL 60559 / US
02 / Schwartz, Krista S.
953 Jennifer Drive
Batavia, IL 60510 / US
03 / Carleton, Allison A.
1425 Leavitt
Chicago, IL 60622 / US
04 / Fitzpatrick, Catherine M.
953 Jennifer Drive
Batavia, IL 60510 / US
[1994/44]
Representative(s)Cleary, Fidelma , et al
NCR Limited
International Patent Department
206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Cleary, Fidelma , et al
International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Former [1996/24]Robinson, Robert George , et al
International Intellectual Property Department, NCR LIMITED, 915 High Road, North Finchley
London N12 8QJ / GB
Former [1994/44]Robinson, Robert George
International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley
London N12 8QJ / GB
Application number, filing date94301825.915.03.1994
[1994/44]
Priority number, dateUS1993003360219.03.1993         Original published format: US 33602
[1994/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0622930
Date:02.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0622930
Date:05.06.1996
[1996/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/18
[1994/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/44]
TitleGerman:Teilung der Anwendungen für Rechneranordnung mit Zusammenarbeit[1994/44]
English:Application sharing for computer collaboration system[1994/44]
French:Partage d'application pour système d'ordinateurs à collaboration[1994/44]
Examination procedure05.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/05]
24.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/42]
07.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0351234  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP.) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 5 - line 15 * * column 2, line 11 - line 62 * * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 46 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-6;
 [Y]EP0319232  (XEROX CORP.) [Y] 2-6 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 1 * * page 8, line 13 - line 37 * * page 10, line 42 - page 11, line 53 * * column A *;
 [A]EP0398640  (IBM) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 58 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 46 *;
 [A]  - D.POUNTAIN, "THE X WINDOW SYSTEM", BYTE, ST PETERBOROUGH US, vol. 14, no. 1, pages 353 - 360, XP000566012 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *