Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0675128

EP0675128 - Method for preparation of stable water-borne silane compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sivento Inc.
379 Interpace Parkway Builing C Parsippany
New Jersey 07054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/48]For all designated states
Sivento Inc.
379 Interpace Parkway Builing C
Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
Sivento Inc.
65 Challenger Road
Ridgfield Park NJ 07660 / US
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
CREANOVA, INC.
80 Centennial Avenue, PO Box 456
Piscataway, New Jersey 08855-0456 / US
Former [1995/40]For all designated states
HÜLS AMERICA INC.
80 Centennial Avenue, PO Box 46
Piscataway, New Jersey 08855-0456 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Steinmetz, James R.
4344 Province Line Road Princeton
New Jersey / US
02 / Arkles, Barry C.
428 Blue Bird Lane Dresher
Pennsylvania / US
[1995/40]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/40]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Eastcheap House Central Approach
Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB
Application number, filing date94302373.931.03.1994
[1995/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0675128
Date:04.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0675128
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.1994
ClassificationInternational:C07F7/08
[1995/40]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung stabiler wässriger Silan-Zusammensetzungen[1995/40]
English:Method for preparation of stable water-borne silane compositions[1995/40]
French:Procédé de préparation de compositions de silane aqueux stables[2000/44]
Former [1995/40]Procédé de préparation de compositions
Examination procedure29.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/48]
19.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
05.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2001Fee for grant paid
14.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01201939.4  / EP1136494
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0049365  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4 *;
 [A]FR1100235  (DOW CORNING) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 3 - line 19; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2108984  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5051129  (CUTHBERT ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1 * examples 1,2 *;
 [D]US5073195  (CUTHBERT ROBERT L [US], et al)